Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans-Jørn Østergaard Andersen | 03.11.1988 | 10.12.1990 | direktion |
Knud Jensen | 03.11.1988 | 30.08.1990 | direktion |
Joachim Eduard Wengenroth | 03.11.1988 | 09.10.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Folmer Stoltenborg | 03.11.1988 | 30.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Knud Jensen | 03.11.1988 | 30.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Allan Andersen | 03.11.1988 | 30.08.1990 | formand |
Corny Pedersen | 03.11.1988 | 09.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Poul Møller Andersen | 03.11.1988 | 09.10.1989 | formand |