Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jim Tommy Nikolajsen | 01.03.1988 | 06.08.1998 | direktion |
Roal Lauge Manley | 01.03.1988 | 07.01.1994 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.03.1988 | 16.11.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1988 | 16.11.1988 | bestyrelse |