Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Bertelsen | 01.01.1988 | 16.03.1993 | direktion |
Jens Johannes Pedersen | 01.01.1988 | 11.12.1989 | direktion |
Aage Moltke-Leth | 01.01.1988 | 11.12.1989 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 27.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lone Bertelsen | 01.01.1988 | 16.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Carl Erik Nissen Christensen | 01.01.1988 | 20.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1988 | 27.06.1988 | bestyrelse |