Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Preben Andersen | 01.11.1987 | 05.12.1991 | direktion |
Gynther Wiesel | 01.11.1987 | 27.12.1990 | direktion |
Torben Krona Scharff | 01.11.1987 | 27.12.1990 | direktion |
Leif Max Hansen | 01.11.1987 | 28.03.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Ole Lorenzen Jessen | 01.11.1987 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Gynther Wiesel | 01.11.1987 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Rode | 01.11.1987 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Preben Andersen | 01.11.1987 | 05.12.1991 | bestyrelse |