Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Margit Solveig Ulrika Winkler | 05.01.2012 | 03.03.2014 | adm. dir |
Lars Deleuran | 04.08.2011 | 05.01.2012 | adm. dir |
Mikael Heé | 13.01.2011 | 04.08.2011 | adm. dir |
Lars Arndt Nielsen | 07.09.2010 | 04.08.2011 | direktion |
Ole Bang Nielsen | 14.01.2003 | 20.12.2010 | adm. dir |
Peter Kragh Falkenberg | 01.05.2002 | 10.06.2005 | direktion |
Stig Christiansen | 16.12.1997 | 13.05.2002 | direktion |
Ole Robert Laustsen | 01.01.1922 | 16.12.1997 | direktion |
Bent Arentoft | 01.01.1922 | 04.03.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mikkel Irminger Sarbo | 28.02.2011 | 30.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Palle Lang Christensen | 22.02.2010 | 30.01.2012 | suppleant |
Merete Holst | 23.02.2009 | 30.01.2012 | suppleant |
Søren Dahl Kühlwein Kristiansen | 26.02.2007 | 03.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Søren Kristian Friis | 26.02.2007 | 03.03.2014 | formand |
Lars Deleuran | 09.03.2006 | 03.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Varny Møller Nielsen | 09.03.2006 | 30.01.2012 | suppleant |
Jacob Agertoft Nielsen | 09.03.2006 | 22.02.2010 | suppleant |
Jesper Rosenvinge | 09.03.2006 | 22.02.2010 | suppleant |
Søren Dahl Kühlwein Kristiansen | 09.03.2006 | 26.02.2007 | suppleant |
John Skjødt | 17.05.2004 | 30.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Løfvall Lindhardt | 08.02.2004 | 09.03.2006 | suppleant |
Christian Morten Maltesen | 08.02.2004 | 09.03.2006 | suppleant |
John Skjødt | 08.02.2004 | 17.05.2004 | suppleant |
Sven Arendt Thomsen | 17.06.2003 | 09.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kim Edvard Sundgaard | 02.02.2003 | 09.03.2006 | suppleant |
Lars Deleuran | 02.02.2003 | 02.02.2003 | suppleant |
Jan Steen Hansen | 13.03.2002 | 30.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jan Lars Adolfsen | 12.02.2002 | 08.02.2004 | suppleant |
Johnni Eddy Albin Nielsen | 12.02.2002 | 08.02.2004 | suppleant |
Jan Hemdorff Haunstrup | 07.02.2002 | 12.02.2002 | suppleant |
Jan Steen Hansen | 06.02.2001 | 13.03.2002 | suppleant |
Erik Stanley Jensen | 06.02.2001 | 12.02.2002 | suppleant |
Gunnar Wennberg | 06.02.2001 | 12.02.2002 | suppleant |
Solveig Margrethe Lindvig Nielsen | 03.02.1998 | 17.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Benny Olsen | 03.02.1998 | 06.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Leif Broe | 01.01.1922 | 26.02.2007 | formand |
Rolf Grouleff Lottrup | 01.01.1922 | 02.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Bøttner | 01.01.1922 | 04.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Erik Stanley Jensen | 01.01.1922 | 03.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jan Bacher Wybrandt | 01.01.1922 | 03.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Conny Albert Sørensen | 01.01.1922 | 04.03.1996 | bestyrelse |