Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnni Mannich Nielsen | 01.02.2003 | 21.08.2018 | adm. dir |
Kaj Mannich Nielsen | 29.12.1986 | 01.02.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jack Eriksson | 20.06.2012 | 13.06.2018 | bestyrelse |
Allan Jensen | 20.06.2012 | 13.06.2018 | bestyrelse |
Ricki Baron Stennicke | 20.06.2012 | 21.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Per Andersen | 04.08.2010 | 20.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Karina Nielsen | 04.08.2010 | 20.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jim Olsen | 05.02.2003 | 04.08.2010 | formand |
Johnni Mannich Nielsen | 30.04.2001 | 21.08.2018 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Mannich Nielsen | 29.12.1986 | 04.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henning John Schou | 29.12.1986 | 04.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Jensen | 29.12.1986 | 27.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christensen | 29.12.1986 | 12.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ole Brøns | 29.12.1986 | 03.04.1992 | bestyrelse |