Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karsten Kristensen | 01.07.1986 | 04.10.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karsten Kristensen | 01.07.1986 | 04.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Birte Merrild Kristensen | 01.07.1986 | 04.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Hugo Kristensen | 01.07.1986 | 04.10.1993 | bestyrelse |
Else Visgaard | 01.07.1986 | 23.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Steen Beck-Hansen | 01.07.1986 | 12.05.1989 | bestyrelse |