Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Schertiger | 19.09.2008 | 03.01.2013 | adm. dir |
Steen Knuppert-Hansen | 12.06.2006 | 29.08.2008 | direktion |
Arne Toft | 08.02.2006 | 12.06.2006 | direktion |
Anders Sandström | 24.08.2005 | 03.01.2013 | direktion |
Torben Steen Nordquist | 24.08.2005 | 19.09.2008 | adm. dir |
Jesper Boysen | 01.12.2001 | 24.08.2005 | direktion |
Kurt Dahl Mathiasen | 01.04.2001 | 04.10.2004 | direktion |
Johannes Huus Bogh | 28.02.2001 | 01.12.2001 | adm. dir |
Birger Møllevang | 01.06.1999 | 01.04.2001 | direktion |
Gynther Kohls | 01.01.1999 | 28.02.2001 | adm. dir |
Knud Foldschack | 21.08.1997 | 01.01.1999 | direktion |
Villy Jensen | 05.07.1996 | 12.03.1999 | direktion |
William Leedgaard | 05.07.1996 | 19.12.1996 | direktion |
Torben Frantzolet | 10.05.1986 | 01.01.1999 | adm. dir |
Jens Olsen | 10.05.1986 | 19.03.1992 | direktion |
Nils Winther-Rasmussen | 10.05.1986 | 21.01.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Buch-Andersen | 26.04.2007 | 03.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Carl Gustav Ingemar Wernhoff | 21.07.2005 | 03.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jan Oscar Frøshaug | 21.07.2005 | 03.01.2013 | formand |
Morten Lund | 21.04.2005 | 01.06.2008 | bestyrelse |
Anette Susanne Flørning | 21.04.2005 | 01.06.2008 | personlig_suppleant |
Mogens Petersen | 21.04.2005 | 01.06.2008 | personlig_suppleant |
Nils Winther-Rasmussen | 22.04.2002 | 03.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Else Marie Birgitte Nielsen | 25.04.2001 | 01.06.2008 | bestyrelse |
Brian Bay Sørensen | 25.04.2001 | 21.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peter Jensen | 25.04.2001 | 21.04.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Alf Skovbo | 25.04.2001 | 21.04.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Johannes Huus Bogh | 25.04.2001 | 22.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Else Marie Birgitte Nielsen | 25.04.2001 | 25.04.2001 | suppleant |
Else Marie Birgitte Nielsen | 07.03.2001 | 01.04.2001 | personlig_suppleant |
Carsten Dencker Nielsen | 22.04.1999 | 25.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Leschly | 21.09.1998 | 03.01.2013 | næstformand |
Laurids Andersen Jessen | 21.09.1998 | 21.07.2005 | formand |
Gynther Kohls | 21.09.1998 | 22.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Leif Thomsen | 24.04.1997 | 25.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Kvistgaard Pedersen | 24.04.1997 | 07.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Carl Erik Skovgaard | 10.05.1986 | 22.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Nils Winther-Rasmussen | 10.05.1986 | 21.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jon Henrik Krabbe | 10.05.1986 | 21.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Kolding | 10.05.1986 | 21.09.1998 | formand |
Jørgen Basso Larsen | 10.05.1986 | 21.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Claus Frees Sørensen | 10.05.1986 | 21.06.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens Olsen | 10.05.1986 | 24.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Nils Winther-Rasmussen | 10.05.1986 | 21.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Holm Dizon | 10.05.1986 | 21.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Steen Grove Hauerbach | 10.05.1986 | 21.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Peter Kjær | 10.05.1986 | 21.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Frank Obel | 10.05.1986 | 21.01.1991 | bestyrelse |