Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Rønne | 16.04.2003 | 06.04.2005 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 21.01.2003 | 16.04.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Rønne | 16.04.2003 | 06.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Claus Terp Jensen | 16.04.2003 | 27.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jan Georg Brethvad | 16.04.2003 | 01.09.2004 | formand |
Kim Madsen | 21.01.2003 | 16.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Helle Garde Carlsen | 21.01.2003 | 16.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 21.01.2003 | 16.04.2003 | formand |