Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Drud Hansen | 15.03.1982 | 07.08.1997 | direktion |
Steen Thy Tygesen | 15.03.1982 | 17.02.1994 | direktion |
Gunnar Hansen | 15.03.1982 | 23.06.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Drud Hansen | 15.03.1982 | 07.08.1997 | bestyrelse |
John Eric Rath Petersen | 15.03.1982 | 07.08.1997 | bestyrelse |
Hans Clausen | 15.03.1982 | 07.08.1997 | bestyrelse |
Steen Thy Tygesen | 15.03.1982 | 06.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Frantz Carsten Carstensen Dolberg | 15.03.1982 | 13.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Eric Rath Petersen | 15.03.1982 | 13.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Anders Bøgh Andersen | 15.03.1982 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Poul Kjeldahl | 15.03.1982 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Houlind | 15.03.1982 | 27.01.1988 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Hansen | 15.03.1982 | 27.01.1988 | bestyrelse |