Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Lindersson Søndergaard | 26.09.2005 | 07.03.2006 | direktion |
Hans Christian Wenzelsen | 20.09.2003 | 26.09.2005 | direktion |
Michael Gerard Cohen | 24.01.2003 | 20.09.2003 | direktion |
Michael Vestergaard Jensen | 03.01.2002 | 30.06.2003 | direktion |
Johan Peter Lyngdorf | 01.12.1981 | 03.01.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
David Rollins Froker | 16.06.2004 | 07.03.2006 | formand |
Steven Raft | 16.06.2004 | 16.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Michael Vestergaard Jensen | 03.01.2002 | 30.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Eugene Julias Czerwinski | 01.12.1981 | 20.09.2003 | formand |
Johan Peter Lyngdorf | 01.12.1981 | 03.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Poul Kristensen | 01.12.1981 | 16.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Connie Diane Czerwinski | 01.12.1981 | 16.02.1990 | bestyrelse |