Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 19.12.1983 | 29.05.2002 | direktion |
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 19.12.1983 | 29.11.1993 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 19.12.1983 | 09.06.1993 | direktion |
Aage Egede Schulz | 19.12.1983 | 02.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 19.12.1983 | 29.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Per Ganesh Nilakantan | 19.12.1983 | 29.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Hubertus Harboe-Schmidt | 19.12.1983 | 29.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 19.12.1983 | 29.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lone Christensen | 19.12.1983 | 29.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Stiedl | 19.12.1983 | 29.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Tine Kyster Ørbekker | 19.12.1983 | 09.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Søren Egede Schulz | 19.12.1983 | 02.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Aage Egede Schulz | 19.12.1983 | 02.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bente Schulz | 19.12.1983 | 02.02.1993 | bestyrelse |