Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Lund-Larsen | 18.02.2000 | 13.03.2008 | direktion |
Bent Jørgensen | 02.11.1979 | 18.02.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Winnie Frederiksen | 02.11.1979 | 31.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Merete Luann Lund-Larsen | 02.11.1979 | 31.08.1993 | bestyrelse |