Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jess Aagaard | 28.07.1979 | 03.10.2002 | direktion |
Arne Henry Krusholm | 28.07.1979 | 14.02.1994 | direktion |
Henrik Svanholm | 28.07.1979 | 05.03.1992 | direktion |
Knud Thorbøll Locht | 28.07.1979 | 16.10.1989 | direktion |
Wilhelm Mule Malling | 28.07.1979 | 29.03.1988 | direktion |