Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Jørgensen | 09.10.1997 | 12.01.1998 | direktion |
Per Fabricius Stolberg | 05.04.1979 | 25.08.2008 | direktion |
Benny Ruben Larsson | 05.04.1979 | 09.10.1997 | direktion |
Jørgen Laursen | 05.04.1979 | 31.10.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marianne Stolberg | 14.11.2002 | 25.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Per Fabricius Stolberg | 06.08.1998 | 25.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Andreas Christian Jørgensen | 14.03.1996 | 06.08.1998 | bestyrelse |
Axel Kierkegaard | 05.04.1979 | 25.08.2008 | formand |
Jens Christian Pontoppidan | 05.04.1979 | 14.11.2002 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Leo Balle Sørensen | 05.04.1979 | 12.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Christian Ejlersen | 05.04.1979 | 12.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Povl Erik Outzen | 05.04.1979 | 12.01.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Freddy Rødgaard Pedersen | 05.04.1979 | 12.01.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Jørgen Laursen | 05.04.1979 | 14.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lilian Edith Laursen | 05.04.1979 | 15.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Frank Stokholm Petersen | 05.04.1979 | 27.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Povl Ravnborg Thude | 05.04.1979 | 27.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Erik Varst | 05.04.1979 | 27.12.1993 | personlig_suppleant |
Laila Bruhn | 05.04.1979 | 27.12.1993 | personlig_suppleant |
Peter Groth Bruun | 05.04.1979 | 22.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Niels Laursen | 05.04.1979 | 22.12.1989 | bestyrelse |