Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Keld Arenholt Christensen | 16.11.2005 | 10.11.2009 | adm. dir |
Svend Kragh | 29.06.1979 | 16.11.2005 | direktion |
Gunvor Sand Kristensen | 29.06.1979 | 02.11.1993 | direktion |
Ole Mølgaard Kristensen | 29.06.1979 | 21.04.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Mølgaard Kristensen | 29.06.1979 | 02.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Søren Mølgaard Kristensen | 29.06.1979 | 02.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Gunvor Sand Kristensen | 29.06.1979 | 02.11.1993 | bestyrelse |