Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Sørensen | 06.01.2000 | 18.10.2005 | direktion |
Peer Sørensen | 05.09.1979 | 06.01.2000 | direktion |
Henning Gunnar Sørensen | 05.09.1979 | 06.03.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Riise-Knudsen | 26.03.2001 | 18.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Kaare Thal-Jantzen | 26.03.2001 | 18.10.2005 | formand |
Erik Leon Ziegler | 06.03.2000 | 18.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Frans Peter Rud | 06.03.2000 | 22.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Henning Gunnar Sørensen | 06.01.2000 | 06.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Lars Sørensen | 01.03.1998 | 18.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Tom Srijan Sørensen | 01.03.1998 | 18.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peer Sørensen | 01.03.1998 | 06.01.2000 | bestyrelse |