Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Dreyer | 01.01.2003 | 09.05.2003 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Lindegaard | 14.02.1974 | 12.12.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Krogh | 11.12.2001 | 09.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Dreyer | 11.12.2001 | 09.05.2003 | formand |
Flemming Conrad | 06.09.1999 | 11.12.2001 | formand |
Bent Erichsen | 06.09.1999 | 21.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Eyvind Frank Toxborg | 14.02.1974 | 09.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Delman | 14.02.1974 | 09.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Wolfgang Erich Paiker | 14.02.1974 | 21.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jan Opprud Jakobsen | 14.02.1974 | 08.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kai Hyldebrandt Hemmingsen | 14.02.1974 | 08.04.1999 | formand |
Niels Jørn Ramsing | 14.02.1974 | 09.06.1996 | bestyrelse |