Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ejvind Sørensen | 06.01.1998 | 12.07.2010 | direktion |
Hans Kurt Langsig Rasmussen | 15.05.1979 | 12.07.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Kurt Langsig Rasmussen | 13.08.2008 | 12.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Nils Sand Hansen | 13.08.2008 | 12.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Larsen | 13.08.2008 | 12.07.2010 | formand |
Ejvind Sørensen | 06.01.1998 | 06.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kurt Langsig Rasmussen | 15.05.1979 | 06.01.1998 | bestyrelse |