Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rolf Sønder | 25.03.1999 | 23.08.2004 | direktion |
Poul Sønder | 19.12.1978 | 23.08.2004 | direktion |
Peter Rune Mortensen | 19.12.1978 | 26.02.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Sønder | 19.12.1978 | 23.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Erik Sønder | 19.12.1978 | 23.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Knud Borup Jensen | 19.12.1978 | 23.08.2004 | formand |
Rolf Sønder | 19.12.1978 | 25.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kurth Erik Eriksen | 19.12.1978 | 03.05.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Esbensen | 19.12.1978 | 26.02.1988 | bestyrelse |
Svend Winther | 19.12.1978 | 26.02.1988 | bestyrelse |
Inge Ambrosius | 19.12.1978 | 26.02.1988 | bestyrelse |