Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karl Kristian Schmidt | 21.06.1978 | 20.03.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Elin Margrethe Schmidt | 06.12.1996 | 20.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Karl Kristian Schmidt | 21.06.1978 | 20.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Peter Dahl | 21.06.1978 | 20.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Hansen Schmidt | 21.06.1978 | 06.12.1996 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Marius Almind Nielsen | 21.06.1978 | 06.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Aage Christensen | 21.06.1978 | 06.09.1990 | bestyrelse |