Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Egon Helshøj | 29.03.1978 | 04.12.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Robert Wünsch | 10.12.2005 | 04.12.2007 | formand |
Jan Ganwills | 31.05.2003 | 04.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Christian Møller | 18.01.2001 | 31.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Ole Mosgaard | 23.05.1996 | 01.12.2005 | formand |
Jan Ganwills | 27.07.1995 | 02.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Egon Helshøj | 29.03.1978 | 04.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Tage Thue Tobiasen | 29.03.1978 | 15.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bent Helshøj | 29.03.1978 | 14.10.1992 | bestyrelse |