Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hanne Lund | 15.03.1977 | 27.06.1997 | direktion |
Aage Halby Strandfelt | 15.03.1977 | 25.09.1995 | direktion |
Peter Christensen | 15.03.1977 | 13.01.1995 | direktion |
Allan Søgaard | 15.03.1977 | 16.11.1992 | direktion |
Mogens Harbak | 15.03.1977 | 17.01.1989 | direktion |