Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Maria Louise Bjerregaard Jensen | 13.12.1977 | 10.04.2019 | direktion |
Jon Steen Jensen | 13.12.1977 | 11.06.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Anton Suffolk | 18.12.2000 | 01.07.2006 | bestyrelse |
Maria Louise Bjerregaard Jensen | 13.12.1977 | 29.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Birte Ellen Sundbye | 13.12.1977 | 29.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jon Steen Jensen | 13.12.1977 | 29.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Villum Villumsen | 13.12.1977 | 18.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Sven Borch Nielsen | 13.12.1977 | 11.06.1993 | bestyrelse |