Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 22.12.1993 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 15.06.1977 | 19.05.2003 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 15.06.1977 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Ole Langkjær Christensen | 15.06.1977 | 03.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 22.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 15.06.1977 | 19.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Per Ganesh Nilakantan | 15.06.1977 | 19.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Hubertus Harboe-Schmidt | 15.06.1977 | 19.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lone Christensen | 15.06.1977 | 22.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Stiedl | 15.06.1977 | 22.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Tine Kyster Ørbekker | 15.06.1977 | 20.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Niels Erik Hansen | 15.06.1977 | 03.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Sten Christensen | 15.06.1977 | 03.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ole Langkjær Christensen | 15.06.1977 | 03.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Horslund Christensen | 15.06.1977 | 03.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Menke | 15.06.1977 | 20.09.1988 | bestyrelse |