Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Laurits Rasmussen | 26.02.2002 | 23.10.2002 | direktion |
John Søndergaard Hansen | 15.07.1999 | 26.02.2002 | direktion |
Aage Bendy Bjerregaard | 23.02.1977 | 15.07.1999 | direktion |
Ole Jensen | 23.02.1977 | 02.06.1989 | direktion |
Poul-Erik Munksgaard | 23.02.1977 | 11.05.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Gottschalck | 19.06.2002 | 23.10.2002 | formand |
Henrik Scharling | 19.06.2002 | 23.10.2002 | næstformand |
Carl Laurits Rasmussen | 26.02.2002 | 23.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Aage Bendy Bjerregaard | 26.02.2002 | 19.06.2002 | næstformand |
John Søndergaard Hansen | 15.07.1999 | 19.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Gert Gade | 15.07.1999 | 19.06.2002 | formand |