Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Flemming Block Larsen | 13.03.1984 | 24.04.1998 | direktion |
Anthony James Duncan Law | 13.03.1984 | 21.05.1990 | direktion |
Erik Dahl-Jørgensen | 13.03.1984 | 27.02.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Freddy Raoul Berger | 22.02.1996 | 24.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Athol Alexander Hyland | 13.12.1995 | 24.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Torben Flemming Block Larsen | 13.03.1984 | 24.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Michael Charles Harrison | 13.03.1984 | 22.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Harpøth Zilstorff | 13.03.1984 | 13.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Siegfried Lopez | 13.03.1984 | 11.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Theodonis Gelaudie | 13.03.1984 | 17.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Athol Alexander Hyland | 13.03.1984 | 23.06.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Dahl-Jørgensen | 13.03.1984 | 19.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Anthony James Duncan Law | 13.03.1984 | 11.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Gustaf Urban Schyberg | 13.03.1984 | 13.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Richard Ronald Frinch Crofts | 13.03.1984 | 13.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Theodonis Gelaudie | 13.03.1984 | 31.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Berning | 13.03.1984 | 10.11.1988 | bestyrelse |
Niels Michael Andersen | 13.03.1984 | 10.11.1988 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Holger Federspiel | 13.03.1984 | 27.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Jean-Marie Bioul | 13.03.1984 | 27.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Eric Dorhout Mees | 13.03.1984 | 27.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Theodor Ford Prime | 13.03.1984 | 29.08.1988 | personlig_suppleant |
Brandon Weller Sweitzer | 13.03.1984 | 25.03.1988 | bestyrelse |