Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Bork Munter | 01.11.2004 | 02.12.2019 | direktion |
Jørgen Munter | 02.08.2004 | 31.10.2004 | direktion |
Jørgen Bork Munter | 30.06.1976 | 02.08.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulla Hasselby Larsen | 19.11.2006 | 02.12.2019 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Møller | 16.08.2004 | 12.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Phil Bailey | 16.08.2001 | 19.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Elisabeth Nymann Eriksen | 20.12.2000 | 12.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Dana Vavracova Munter | 30.11.1997 | 25.04.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Bork Munter | 30.06.1976 | 02.12.2019 | bestyrelse |
Svend Petersen | 30.06.1976 | 02.12.2019 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Munter | 30.06.1976 | 21.10.1993 | bestyrelse |