Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Madsen | 02.11.1976 | 31.12.1997 | direktion |
Sten Christensen | 02.11.1976 | 28.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Madsen | 02.11.1976 | 31.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Torben Skot-Hansen | 02.11.1976 | 31.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bødker Jensen | 02.11.1976 | 31.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sten Christensen | 02.11.1976 | 28.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Østervold | 02.11.1976 | 28.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Knut Jakob Meland | 02.11.1976 | 28.12.1988 | bestyrelse |