Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 28.01.1994 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 29.05.1976 | 18.06.2001 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 29.05.1976 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Peter Nordahl | 29.05.1976 | 10.08.1992 | direktion |
Jan Andersen | 29.05.1976 | 10.08.1992 | direktion |