Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Frederik Thoresen Jensen | 12.07.1977 | 03.07.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Neels Rehl | 12.07.1977 | 03.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Carl Frederik Thoresen Jensen | 12.07.1977 | 03.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Olof Ryving-Jensen | 12.07.1977 | 03.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Bent Andersen | 12.07.1977 | 30.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Poul-Erik Petersen | 12.07.1977 | 30.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ove Hartvig Hansen | 12.07.1977 | 30.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
John Anker Hansen | 12.07.1977 | 06.11.1987 | bestyrelse |