Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Mikkelsen | 15.10.1985 | 03.05.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Berg | 16.06.2000 | 03.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Einar Johansen | 16.06.2000 | 03.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Mikkelsen | 01.03.1999 | 03.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Henning Holst | 01.03.1999 | 16.06.2000 | bestyrelse |
Per Arild Kastmann | 01.03.1998 | 16.06.2000 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erlend Åsebø | 15.10.1985 | 28.02.1999 | bestyrelse |
Randi Kvissel | 15.10.1985 | 01.03.1998 | bestyrelse |