Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Birger Jensen | 09.09.1985 | 22.12.2003 | direktion |
Erland Androt | 09.09.1985 | 15.07.1996 | direktion |
Carl Arne Øberg-Pedersen | 09.09.1985 | 05.07.1991 | direktion |
Mogens Jensen | 09.09.1985 | 05.07.1991 | direktion |
Villy Verner Andersen | 09.09.1985 | 30.06.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Arne Øberg-Pedersen | 09.09.1985 | 30.06.1987 | bestyrelse |
Villy Verner Andersen | 09.09.1985 | 30.06.1987 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jensen | 09.09.1985 | 30.06.1987 | formand |