Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Vejhe Djurhuus | 10.09.1985 | 24.08.1993 | direktion |
Klaus Kruse Henningsen | 10.09.1985 | 26.01.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Flemming Hansen | 10.09.1985 | 24.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Leif Vejhe Djurhuus | 10.09.1985 | 24.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Pernille Bigaard | 10.09.1985 | 24.08.1993 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Kruse Henningsen | 10.09.1985 | 26.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Leif Carl Christensen | 10.09.1985 | 26.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Aage Cato Spang-Hanssen | 10.09.1985 | 14.04.1988 | bestyrelse |