Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 22.12.1993 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 20.08.1985 | 19.05.2003 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 20.08.1985 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Steen Mathiesen | 20.08.1985 | 22.02.1993 | direktion |
Steen Mathiesen | 20.08.1985 | 11.01.1993 | direktion |