Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Villadsen | 03.11.2004 | 07.04.2010 | direktion |
Hans-Henrik Uttenthal | 01.01.2003 | 03.11.2004 | direktion |
Birgit Stockmarr | 29.03.1995 | 01.01.2003 | direktion |
Henning Erik Buch | 25.06.1985 | 29.03.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Ankjer Jensen | 10.10.2006 | 07.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans-Henrik Uttenthal | 10.10.2006 | 07.04.2010 | formand |
Kim Villadsen | 01.11.2004 | 07.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Poul Nissen | 01.11.2004 | 10.10.2006 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Vang Christensen | 07.08.2003 | 10.10.2006 | bestyrelse |
Dorte Dybdahl Uttenthal | 07.08.2003 | 01.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Stockmarr | 26.06.2002 | 01.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Mildahl Clemmens | 27.05.1999 | 26.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Birger Topp | 02.06.1994 | 02.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Buch | 02.06.1994 | 26.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bent Høy | 25.06.1985 | 02.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Henning Erik Buch | 25.06.1985 | 29.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Stockmarr | 25.06.1985 | 02.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Brandenhoff Nielsen | 25.06.1985 | 02.06.1994 | bestyrelse |