Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Christian Timm | 01.06.1985 | 25.04.1989 | direktion |
Anders Zinck Kærgaard Andersen | 01.06.1985 | 04.12.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Zinck Kærgaard Andersen | 01.06.1985 | 07.07.1987 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Poulsen | 01.06.1985 | 07.07.1987 | bestyrelse |
Pia Rita Engqvist Andersen | 01.06.1985 | 07.07.1987 | bestyrelse |