Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stig Wiberg | 01.05.1985 | 28.04.1997 | direktion |
Kitten Ruth Svejgaard Wiberg | 01.05.1985 | 04.11.1996 | direktion |
Erik Sindberg | 01.05.1985 | 04.04.1995 | direktion |
Aksel Jensen | 01.05.1985 | 04.04.1995 | direktion |
Vagn Johansen | 01.05.1985 | 04.04.1995 | direktion |
Knud Lundgaard Mikkelsen | 01.05.1985 | 04.04.1995 | direktion |