Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 29.11.1993 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 14.05.1985 | 19.05.2003 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 14.05.1985 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Bent Sten Mogensen | 14.05.1985 | 06.01.1993 | direktion |
Finn Mogensen | 14.05.1985 | 06.01.1993 | direktion |
Bent Sten Mogensen | 14.05.1985 | 13.05.1992 | direktion |
Finn Mogensen | 14.05.1985 | 13.05.1992 | direktion |