Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Johannes Gellert Nielsen | 18.03.2002 | 18.11.2004 | adm. dir |
Hans Jørgen Skarsø | 04.07.1985 | 18.03.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Johannes Gellert Nielsen | 04.11.2004 | 18.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Wittendorf Lorentsen | 02.01.2004 | 18.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Dirk Alexander Maria Philips | 02.09.2002 | 18.11.2004 | formand |
Michael Grundt Gotfredsen | 18.03.2002 | 02.01.2004 | bestyrelse |
Thorleif Nohr Blok | 18.03.2002 | 20.12.2002 | formand |
Erling Kristen Mogensen | 08.10.1999 | 18.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peder Hans Ingvartsen | 04.07.1985 | 18.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Skarsø | 04.07.1985 | 18.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Thorkild Ladefoged | 04.07.1985 | 18.03.2002 | formand |
Gudrun Ingvartsen | 04.07.1985 | 10.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bent Jensen | 04.07.1985 | 08.10.1991 | bestyrelse |