Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steffen Gulmann | 30.01.1985 | 23.07.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Geir Magnus Jansen | 30.01.1985 | 23.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Holger Dock | 30.01.1985 | 23.07.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Brusgaard | 30.01.1985 | 23.07.1998 | formand |
Flemming Bo Hansen | 30.01.1985 | 27.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Ole Berntsen Søndergaard | 30.01.1985 | 27.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Finn Nygaard | 30.01.1985 | 21.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Chresten William Reves | 30.01.1985 | 21.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Relster | 30.01.1985 | 21.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hiort-Lorenzen | 30.01.1985 | 21.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Johan Adam Linneballe | 30.01.1985 | 18.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Magnussen | 30.01.1985 | 18.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Berntsen Søndergaard | 30.01.1985 | 26.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hiort-Lorenzen | 30.01.1985 | 26.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Finn Friis Grue | 30.01.1985 | 16.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jan Christer Tragårdh | 30.01.1985 | 13.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Poul Madsen | 30.01.1985 | 13.12.1988 | formand |