Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Werner Fugmann | 25.04.1985 | 19.09.1997 | direktion |
Bo Roland Sobeus | 25.04.1985 | 28.02.1994 | direktion |
Jørgen Clausen | 25.04.1985 | 01.10.1991 | direktion |
Per Skov | 25.04.1985 | 21.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Werner Fugmann | 25.04.1985 | 19.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Steen Thyboe Christensen | 25.04.1985 | 19.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Gerhard Albrechtsen | 25.04.1985 | 19.09.1997 | formand |
Bo Roland Sobeus | 25.04.1985 | 28.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Nielsen | 25.04.1985 | 01.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jens William Werner | 25.04.1985 | 01.10.1991 | formand |
Jørgen Clausen | 25.04.1985 | 01.10.1991 | næstformand |
Per Skov | 25.04.1985 | 21.06.1988 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Lorents Sørensen | 25.04.1985 | 21.06.1988 | næstformand |