Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marcus Choleva | 20.12.1985 | 27.08.2004 | direktion |
Anne-Lise Choleva | 20.12.1985 | 04.06.1993 | direktion |
Niels Berg | 20.12.1985 | 16.10.1989 | direktion |
Peter Lasse Budtz | 20.12.1985 | 13.07.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Yoanna Choleva | 08.07.2002 | 27.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Lise Choleva | 08.06.2000 | 27.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Arnfred Kristensen | 21.05.1999 | 08.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Marcus Choleva | 20.12.1985 | 27.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Poul Munksø | 20.12.1985 | 08.06.2000 | bestyrelse |
Casper Moltke | 20.12.1985 | 21.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Lise Choleva | 20.12.1985 | 04.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Yoanna Choleva | 20.12.1985 | 04.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Oluf Christian Engell | 20.12.1985 | 16.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Sten Magnus | 20.12.1985 | 16.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Niels J Molstad | 20.12.1985 | 16.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Gustav Heiberg Simonsen | 20.12.1985 | 12.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lasse Budtz | 20.12.1985 | 21.08.1987 | bestyrelse |
Torbjørn Nåvli | 20.12.1985 | 21.08.1987 | bestyrelse |