Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Knudsgaard | 12.01.2001 | 10.10.2005 | direktion |
Bent Ove Aarøe | 20.12.1984 | 12.01.2001 | direktion |
Orla Pontoppidan Kristensen | 20.12.1984 | 18.12.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Knudsgaard | 12.01.2001 | 10.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Annette Knudsgaard | 12.01.2001 | 10.10.2005 | formand |
Bent Ove Aarøe | 20.12.1984 | 12.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Vibe Kristensen | 20.12.1984 | 12.01.2001 | bestyrelse |