Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Nymann | 18.01.1985 | 15.10.2021 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rikke Kristina Nymann | 30.09.1996 | 15.10.2021 | formand |
Erik Nymann | 18.01.1985 | 15.10.2021 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Aage Hansen | 18.01.1985 | 15.10.2021 | bestyrelse |
Anna Marie Rygaard Schou | 18.01.1985 | 30.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Karl Alfred Aagaard Schmidt | 18.01.1985 | 20.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Herluf Juhl Skovgaard Pedersen | 18.01.1985 | 20.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Henning Thorsen Larsen | 18.01.1985 | 20.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Falk Brødsgaard | 18.01.1985 | 23.10.1990 | bestyrelse |