Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Aagaard Petersen | 17.01.1985 | 02.09.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Egon Jessen Nielsen | 23.03.2010 | 02.09.2010 | formand |
Anders Aagaard Petersen | 16.10.2001 | 02.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Flodgaard | 01.11.2000 | 23.03.2010 | formand |
Benjamin Sitrit | 08.11.1999 | 16.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Merete Petersen | 19.05.1999 | 01.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Knud Aagaard Petersen | 17.01.1985 | 02.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Carl Erik Skovgaard | 17.01.1985 | 08.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Egon Jessen Nielsen | 17.01.1985 | 19.05.1999 | bestyrelse |