Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tina Brinck Duus | 01.10.2013 | 10.11.2015 | adm. dir |
Morten Solberg Nilsen | 19.03.2013 | 30.09.2013 | adm. dir |
Jan Henrik Andersen | 19.08.2009 | 19.03.2013 | adm. dir |
Michael Grann | 16.02.2009 | 12.08.2009 | direktion |
Erik Winther | 31.01.2006 | 16.02.2009 | adm. dir |
Gunnar Teis Hansen | 06.06.2005 | 31.01.2006 | adm. dir |
Frank Werup | 30.09.2003 | 06.06.2005 | adm. dir |
Björn Erik Julin | 06.12.2000 | 30.09.2003 | direktion |
BO CHRISTER IVERSTAM | 28.01.2000 | 06.12.2000 | direktion |
Roland Hoijar | 15.04.1998 | 28.01.2000 | direktion |
Kurt Kokhauge Larsen | 08.11.1984 | 15.04.1998 | direktion |
Sten Erichsen | 08.11.1984 | 02.10.1995 | direktion |
Søren Høimark | 08.11.1984 | 04.12.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Solberg Nilsen | 01.05.2014 | 10.11.2015 | bestyrelse |
Nicholas Stuart Inkster | 04.04.2014 | 10.11.2015 | formand |
Tina Brinck Duus | 01.10.2013 | 10.11.2015 | bestyrelse |
Päivi Ilona Keränen | 28.08.2013 | 30.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Morten Solberg Nilsen | 19.03.2013 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kalle Petteri Ruuskanen | 09.11.2012 | 03.04.2014 | formand |
Jan Henrik Andersen | 19.08.2009 | 19.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jette Hansen | 12.08.2009 | 27.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Nick Inkster | 16.02.2009 | 09.11.2012 | formand |
Bent Jakobsen | 16.02.2009 | 12.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Grann | 16.02.2009 | 12.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Lene Kalhøj | 18.02.2008 | 16.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Erik Winther | 31.01.2006 | 16.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Harald Selg | 31.01.2006 | 16.02.2009 | formand |
Jacob Hagemann Jensen | 31.01.2006 | 18.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Søren Kjelstrup | 06.06.2005 | 31.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Carl-Henrik Andreason | 18.02.2005 | 31.01.2006 | formand |
Gunnar Teis Hansen | 30.09.2003 | 31.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Frank Werup | 30.09.2003 | 06.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Björn Erik Julin | 06.12.2000 | 30.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bendt Otto Elfang | 12.05.2000 | 18.02.2005 | formand |
Susanne Løvborg | 12.05.2000 | 30.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
BO CHRISTER IVERSTAM | 28.01.2000 | 06.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Lars Eduard Klarskov Petersen | 28.01.2000 | 12.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
GUNNAR SVEN FREDERIK WULFF | 28.01.2000 | 12.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
BO RYNEBRANT | 28.01.2000 | 12.05.2000 | suppleant |
PER OLOF JÖNSSON | 28.01.2000 | 12.05.2000 | formand |
Agneta Margareta Jonsson | 15.04.1998 | 28.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Eva Marianne Droege | 28.08.1996 | 28.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Roland Hoijar | 08.11.1984 | 28.01.2000 | formand |
Christer Siemerling | 08.11.1984 | 15.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Niels Jonsson | 08.11.1984 | 28.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bent Nielsen Sonberg | 08.11.1984 | 02.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Sten Erichsen | 08.11.1984 | 02.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bertil Einar Orrebrink | 08.11.1984 | 06.05.1993 | formand |
Jan Helvig | 08.11.1984 | 08.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Søren Høimark | 08.11.1984 | 04.12.1987 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Goran Ronnqvist | 08.11.1984 | 04.12.1987 | bestyrelse |