Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Paul Hegedahl | 03.12.1984 | 01.07.1989 | direktion |
Keld Beltner | 03.12.1984 | 10.04.1989 | direktion |
Paul Hegedahl | 03.12.1984 | 14.01.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Roland Therkelsen | 03.12.1984 | 01.07.1989 | bestyrelse |
Viveca Anna Helena Møller | 03.12.1984 | 01.07.1989 | bestyrelse |
Claus Møller | 03.12.1984 | 01.07.1989 | formand |
Keld Beltner | 03.12.1984 | 10.04.1989 | bestyrelse |
Paul Hegedahl | 03.12.1984 | 14.01.1988 | bestyrelse |