Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Kjestrup | 28.09.1984 | 02.09.1998 | direktion |
Flemming Steenberg | 28.09.1984 | 21.01.1991 | direktion |
Verner Jacobsen | 28.09.1984 | 20.09.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Kjestrup | 28.09.1984 | 02.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ingrid Anette Kjestrup | 28.09.1984 | 02.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Steenberg | 28.09.1984 | 21.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Verner Jacobsen | 28.09.1984 | 20.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Wivian Louise Munch Jacobsen | 28.09.1984 | 20.09.1988 | bestyrelse |