Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Nansen Scherfig | 05.10.1984 | 03.03.2003 | direktion |
Hans Anker Nansen Scherfig | 05.10.1984 | 16.04.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Nansen Scherfig | 05.10.1984 | 03.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Hans Anker Nansen Scherfig | 05.10.1984 | 03.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Knud Nansen Scherfig | 05.10.1984 | 03.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Magda Scherfig | 05.10.1984 | 10.03.1998 | bestyrelse |